LA SB222 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-5)
Status: Passed on June 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Effective date 8/1/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to early literacy. (8/1/21) (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to early literacy. (8/1/21) (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-01 - House - House Vote on SB 222 FINAL PASSAGE (#892) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 222 CO-AUTHORS (#284) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 222 FINAL PASSAGE (#283) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-21SenateEffective date 8/1/2021.
2021-06-21SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 438.
2021-06-06SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/4/2021.
2021-06-03HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2021-06-02SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2021-06-01SenateReceived from the House without amendments.
2021-06-01HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2021-06-01HouseCalled from the calendar.
2021-05-27HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2021.
2021-05-27HouseNotice given.
2021-05-27HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2021-05-26HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/27/2021.
2021-05-18HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-05-17HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2021-05-13HouseReported favorably (9-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-05-10HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
2021-05-06HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2021-05-06SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-05-04SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-05-03SenateReported with amendments.
2021-04-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education.
2021-04-02SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=SB222&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1212317
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1219265
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1230407
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1235894
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218865
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218218
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1219266
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1212318
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218761
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218912
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220837
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220787
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1230931
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1235985
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1221824
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1221826
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1230234

Bill Comments

feedback