LA SB222 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-04 - Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Revenue & Fiscal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides an insurance premium discount for members of the Louisiana National Guard who have not been activated. (8/1/18) (EG -$1,100,000 GF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides an insurance premium discount for members of the Louisiana National Guard who have not been activated. (8/1/18) (EG -$1,100,000 GF RV See Note)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-04SenateRead by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
2018-03-22SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-03-21SenateReported with amendments.
2018-03-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2018-03-01SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback