LA SB222 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 71-44-2)
Status: Passed on June 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-23 - Effective date 6/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides benefits for firemen and law enforcement officers who suffer a catastrophic injury resulting in permanent and total disability caused by an individual with the specific intent to kill an officer while the officer is engaged in the performance of his official duties. (gov sig) (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides benefits for firemen and law enforcement officers who suffer a catastrophic injury resulting in permanent and total disability caused by an individual with the specific intent to kill an officer while the officer is engaged in the performance of his official duties. (gov sig) (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)

Sponsors

Sen. Dale Erdey [R]Sen. John Alario [R]Sen. R Allain [R]Sen. Conrad Appel [R]
Sen. Regina Barrow [D]Sen. Wesley Bishop [D]Sen. Gerald Boudreaux [D]Sen. Troy Carter [D]
Sen. Norby Chabert [R]Sen. Dan Claitor [R]Sen. Yvonne Dorsey-Colomb [D]Sen. Patrick Cortez [R]
Sen. Jack Donahue [R]Sen. James Fannin [R]Sen. Ryan Gatti [R]Sen. Sharon Hewitt [R]
Sen. Ronnie Johns [R]Sen. Eric LaFleur [D]Sen. Eddie Lambert [R]Sen. Gerald Long [R]
Sen. W. Jay Luneau [D]Sen. Daniel Martiny [R]Sen. John Milkovich [D]Sen. Fred Mills [R]
Sen. Beth Mizell [R]Sen. Jean-Paul Morrell [D]Sen. Dan Morrish [R]Sen. Barrow Peacock [R]
Sen. Jonathan Perry [R]Sen. Karen Peterson [D]Sen. Neil Riser [R]Sen. Gary Smith [D]
Sen. John Smith [R]Sen. Gregory Tarver [D]Sen. Francis Thompson [D]Sen. Michael Walsworth [R]
Sen. Rick Ward [D]Sen. Mack White [R]Rep. Mark Abraham [R]Rep. Beryl Amedee [R]
Rep. John Anders [D]Rep. James Armes [D]Rep. Tony Bacala [R]Rep. Lawrence Bagley [R]
Rep. John Bagneris [D]Rep. Taylor Barras [R]Rep. John Berthelot [R]Rep. Robert Billiot [D]
Rep. Joseph Bouie [D]Rep. Christopher Broadwater [R]Rep. Terry Brown [I]Rep. Thomas Carmody [R]
Rep. Barbara Carpenter [D]Rep. Gary Carter [D]Rep. Charles Chaney [R]Rep. Patrick Connick [R]
Rep. Jean-paul Coussan [R]Rep. Kenny Cox [D]Rep. Raymond Crews [R]Rep. George Cromer [R]
Rep. Michael Danahay [D]Rep. Paula Davis [R]Rep. Phillip DeVillier [R]Rep. Stephen Dwight [R]
Rep. Rick Edmonds [R]Rep. Julie Emerson [R]Rep. Reid Falconer [R]Rep. Franklin Foil [R]
Rep. A.B. Franklin [D]Rep. Jerry Gisclair [D]Rep. Cedric Glover [D]Rep. John Guinn [R]
Rep. Jeff Hall [D]Rep. Kenneth Havard [R]Rep. Lowell Hazel [R]Sen. Bob Hensgens [R]
Rep. Stephanie Hilferty [R]Rep. Dorothy Hill [D]Rep. Frank Hoffmann [R]Rep. Dodie Horton [R]
Rep. Frank Howard [R]Rep. Marcus Hunter [D]Rep. Mike Huval [R]Rep. Barry Ivey [R]
Rep. Katrina Jackson [D]Rep. Edward James [D]Rep. Samuel Jenkins [D]Rep. Edmond Jordan [D]
Rep. Nancy Landry [R]Rep. Bernard LeBas [D]Rep. Walt Leger [D]Rep. Rodney Lyons [D]
Rep. Sherman Mack [R]Rep. Tanner Magee [R]Rep. Denise Marcelle [D]Rep. Joseph Marino [I]
Rep. Jack McFarland [R]Rep. Blake Miguez [R]Rep. Gregory Miller [R]Rep. Helena Moreno [D]
Rep. John Morris [R]Rep. James Morris [R]Rep. Barbara Norton [D]Rep. Vincent Pierre [D]
Sen. Edward Price [D]Rep. Stephen Pugh [R]Rep. Steve Pylant [R]Rep. Eugene Reynolds [D]
Rep. Clay Schexnayder [R]Rep. Alan Seabaugh [R]Rep. Scott Simon [R]Rep. Patricia Smith [D]
Rep. Joseph Stagni [D]Rep. John Stefanski [R]Rep. Julie Stokes [R]Rep. Polly Thomas [R]
Rep. Jerome Zeringue [R]

Roll Calls

2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 222 CONCUR (#886) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - House - House Vote on SB 222 FINAL PASSAGE (#777) (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 222 FINAL PASSAGE (#479) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-23SenateEffective date 6/23/2017.
2017-06-23SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 391.
2017-06-08SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2017-06-07HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2017-06-07SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2017-06-06SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
2017-06-05SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2017-06-05HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 105, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2017-06-04HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/05/17.
2017-06-04HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2017-06-02HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2017-06-01HouseReported with amendments (13-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2017-05-30HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
2017-05-25HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2017-05-24SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered re- reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2017-05-23SenateRead by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered reengrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2017-05-22SenateReported with amendments.
2017-04-26SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
2017-04-25SenateReported with amendments.
2017-04-10SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2017-03-31SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=17rs&b=SB222&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1031532
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1035572
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1043805
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1044898
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1049368
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1052415
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1035491
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1043513
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1043571
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1044409
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1046620
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1046895
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1047085
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1047521
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1048392
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1049096
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1049133
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1031533
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1033324
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1036291
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1036399
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1044382
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1044503
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1045001
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1046617
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1046899
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1049876
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1051447
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1044848
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1049007
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1049245

Bill Comments

feedback