LA SB221 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-3-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective date 11/1/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the cleansing period for certain crimes applicable to habitual offender penalty enhancements. (11/1/17)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the cleansing period for certain crimes applicable to habitual offender penalty enhancements. (11/1/17)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 221 CONCUR (#885) (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - House - House Vote on SB 221 FINAL PASSAGE (#770) (Y: 83 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 221 FINAL PASSAGE (#317) (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15SenateEffective date 11/1/2017.
2017-06-15SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 282.
2017-06-08SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2017-06-07HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2017-06-07SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2017-06-06SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 23 yeas and 11 nays.
2017-06-05SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2017-06-05HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 83, nays 17. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2017-06-05HouseRules suspended, called out of its regular order.
2017-06-02HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/05/17.
2017-06-02HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2017-06-01HouseReported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
2017-05-31HouseReported with amendments (13-0-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2017-05-18HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2017-05-17HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2017-05-16SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 28 yeas and 8 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2017-05-08SenateRead by title; made Special Order of the Day No. 3 for May 16, 2017.
2017-05-03SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2017-05-02SenateReported with amendments.
2017-04-10SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
2017-03-31SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=17rs&b=SB221&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1031530
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1037843
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1042301
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1049427
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1051861
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1037761
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1038625
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1040012
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1045450
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1046381
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1046712
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1049145
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1031531
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1038565
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1042418
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1046383
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1051443
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1042169
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1048976
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1049243

Bill Comments

feedback