LA SB221 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-29 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for the dedications and uses on the deposit of certain monies derived from certain general fund revenues attributable to an increase in the base amount of mineral revenues received by the state as certified by the Revenue Estimating Conference for various Transportation Trust Fund and other transportation uses. (See Act) (EN -$4,400,000 GF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the dedications and uses on the deposit of certain monies derived from certain general fund revenues attributable to an increase in the base amount of mineral revenues received by the state as certified by the Revenue Estimating Conference for various Transportation Trust Fund and other transportation uses. (See Act) (EN -$4,400,000 GF RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 221 CONCUR (#1015) (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-08 - House - House Vote on SB 221 FINAL PASSAGE (#833) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-08 - House - House Vote on SB 221 FINAL PASSAGE (#833) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 221 FINAL PASSAGE (#313) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-29SenateEffective date: See Act.
2015-06-29SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 275.
2015-06-10SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2015-06-09HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2015-06-09SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2015-06-09SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 1 nays.
2015-06-08SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2015-06-08HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2015-06-08HouseRules suspended, called out of its regular order.
2015-06-03HouseScheduled for floor debate on 6/08/2015.
2015-06-03HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2015-06-02HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2015-06-01HouseReported with amendments (15-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2015-05-18HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
2015-05-14HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2015-05-13SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 1 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2015-05-12SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2015-05-11SenateReported with amendments.
2015-04-13SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance.
2015-04-03SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Finance.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=15rs&b=SB221&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=937110
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=946265
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=947942
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=957922
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=960331
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=946230
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=946328
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=947796
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=947323
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=953615
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=953347
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=955288
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=957676
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=937113
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=944061
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=947407
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=947790
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=948068
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=948717
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=953606
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=958280
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=959021
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=947820
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=956995
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=957627
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=957833

Bill Comments

feedback