LA SB218 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-29 - Effective date 8/15/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-29 - Effective date 8/15/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to security retainage under the Private Works Act. (8/15/10)
Title
Provides relative to security retainage under the Private Works Act. (8/15/10)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 218, CONCUR (#1618) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on SB 218, FINAL PASSAGE (#1296) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 218, FINAL PASSAGE (#326) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on SB 218, FINAL PASSAGE (#1296) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 218, FINAL PASSAGE (#326) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-29 | Effective date 8/15/10. | |
2010-06-29 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 638. | |
2010-06-17 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2010-06-16 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-16 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-15 | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays. | |
2010-06-11 | Received from the House with amendments. | |
2010-06-09 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-06-04 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/9/2010. | |
2010-05-24 | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-05-20 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2010-05-19 | Reported with amendments (11-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-04-28 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | |
2010-04-27 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2010-04-26 | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-04-21 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |
2010-04-20 | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. | |
2010-03-29 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Judiciary A. | |
2010-03-17 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Judiciary A. |