LA SB216 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-07 - Effective date 6/7/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-07 - Effective date 6/7/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amends definitions within the Mental Health Counselors Licensing Act. (gov sig)
Title
Amends definitions within the Mental Health Counselors Licensing Act. (gov sig)
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Mills [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 216, CONCUR (#1435) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-23 - House - House Vote on SB 216, FINAL PASSAGE (#1130) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 216, FINAL PASSAGE (#691) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-23 - House - House Vote on SB 216, FINAL PASSAGE (#1130) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 216, FINAL PASSAGE (#691) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-07 | Effective date 6/7/12. | |
2012-06-07 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 636. | |
2012-06-01 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2012-05-30 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-05-29 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-05-28 | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. | |
2012-05-24 | Received from the House with amendments. | |
2012-05-23 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-05-16 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/23/2012. | |
2012-05-14 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-05-11 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2012-05-09 | Reported favorably (13-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2012-05-07 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | |
2012-05-03 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2012-05-02 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-05-02 | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. | |
2012-04-30 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |
2012-04-26 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2012-04-25 | Reported favorably. | |
2012-03-12 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | |
2012-02-28 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |