LA SB214 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-23 - Effective date 6/23/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-23 - Effective date 6/23/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to individual graduation plans and high school curriculum options. (gov sig) (EN INCREASE LF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to individual graduation plans and high school curriculum options. (gov sig) (EN INCREASE LF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 214 CONCUR (#992) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House Vote on SB 214 FINAL PASSAGE (#1044) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 214 FINAL PASSAGE (#282) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House Vote on SB 214 FINAL PASSAGE (#1044) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 214 FINAL PASSAGE (#282) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-23 | Senate | Effective date 6/23/2021. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 458. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/11/2021. |
2021-06-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2021-06-07 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2021-06-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/07/2021. |
2021-06-02 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-06-01 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2021-05-27 | House | Reported favorably (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2021-05-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2021-05-06 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |