LA SB210 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-29 - Effective date 8/15/11.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-29 - Effective date 8/15/11.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Temporarily exempts from tobacco tax cigars and smoking tobacco sampled during the Convention of the International Premium Cigar and Pipe Retailers. (8/15/11) (EN -$50,000 GF RV See Note)
Title
Temporarily exempts from tobacco tax cigars and smoking tobacco sampled during the Convention of the International Premium Cigar and Pipe Retailers. (8/15/11) (EN -$50,000 GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 210, CONCUR (#888) (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-20 - House - House Vote on SB 210, FINAL PASSAGE (#767) (Y: 57 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2011-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 210, FINAL PASSAGE (#380) (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-06-20 - House - House Vote on SB 210, FINAL PASSAGE (#767) (Y: 57 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2011-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 210, FINAL PASSAGE (#380) (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-29 | Effective date 8/15/11. | |
2011-06-29 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 341. | |
2011-06-23 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2011-06-22 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2011-06-22 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2011-06-21 | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 34 yeas and 2 nays. | |
2011-06-20 | Received from the House with amendments. | |
2011-06-20 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 57, nays 31. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-06-20 | Called from the calendar. | |
2011-06-16 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/20/2011. | |
2011-06-16 | Notice given. | |
2011-06-16 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2011-06-15 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/16/2011. | |
2011-06-15 | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2011-06-14 | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2011-06-13 | Reported favorably (13-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2011-06-08 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | |
2011-06-07 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2011-06-06 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 30 yeas and 2 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2011-06-01 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |
2011-05-31 | Reported with amendments. | |
2011-04-25 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. | |
2011-04-15 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |