LA SB21 | 2020 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-28 - Effective date 1/1/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-28 - Effective date 1/1/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for revisions to the fee structure and oversight of the in-service training and educational programs for state employees by the Department of State Civil Service. (1/1/21) (Item #52) (EN NO IMPACT OF RV See Note)
Title
Provides for revisions to the fee structure and oversight of the in-service training and educational programs for state employees by the Department of State Civil Service. (1/1/21) (Item #52) (EN NO IMPACT OF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-15 - House - House Vote on SB 21 FINAL PASSAGE (#153) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 21 FINAL PASSAGE (#18) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 21 FINAL PASSAGE (#18) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-28 | Senate | Effective date 1/1/2021. |
2020-10-28 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 33. |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2020-10-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-10-20 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-10-19 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2020-10-15 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-10-14 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 10/15/20. |
2020-10-14 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-10-14 | House | Rules suspended. |
2020-10-14 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2020-10-14 | House | Reported favorably (14-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2020-10-02 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2020-09-30 | Senate | Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title; ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-09-28 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |