LA SB21 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-17 - Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-17 - Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the amount of compensation dealers may retain for timely filing and remittance of state sales tax. (Item #30) (7/1/20) (EGF DECREASE GF RV See Note)
Title
Provides for the amount of compensation dealers may retain for timely filing and remittance of state sales tax. (Item #30) (7/1/20) (EGF DECREASE GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-17 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |