LA SB207 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-10-1)
Status: Vetoed on July 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on July 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for annual reports on the Coordinated Care Network program and for legislative authority relative to termination of the program. (gov sig)
Title
Provides for annual reports on the Coordinated Care Network program and for legislative authority relative to termination of the program. (gov sig)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 207, CONCUR (#887) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-20 - House - House Vote on SB 207, FINAL PASSAGE (#746) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-06-20 - House - House Vote on SB 207, AMENDMENT # 337 BY KATZ, MOTION TO ADOPT (#745) (Y: 37 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 207, FINAL PASSAGE (#351) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-06-20 - House - House Vote on SB 207, FINAL PASSAGE (#746) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-06-20 - House - House Vote on SB 207, AMENDMENT # 337 BY KATZ, MOTION TO ADOPT (#745) (Y: 37 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 207, FINAL PASSAGE (#351) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-01 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2011-06-23 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2011-06-22 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2011-06-22 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2011-06-21 | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. | |
2011-06-20 | Received from the House with amendments. | |
2011-06-20 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-06-19 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/20/2011. | |
2011-06-16 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/19/2011. | |
2011-06-16 | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2011-06-15 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2011-06-14 | Reported with amendments (12-2) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2011-06-07 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | |
2011-06-06 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2011-06-02 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2011-06-02 | Rules suspended. Called from the calendar. | |
2011-05-10 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |
2011-05-05 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |
2011-05-04 | Reported with amendments. | |
2011-04-25 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Health and Welfare. | |
2011-04-15 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Health and Welfare. |