LA SB204 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Effective date 8/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Effective date 8/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to caller ID spoofing. (8/1/18)
Title
Provides relative to caller ID spoofing. (8/1/18)
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Smith [D] | Sen. Patrick Cortez [R] | Sen. Daniel Martiny [R] | Sen. Beth Mizell [R] |
Rep. Francis Thompson [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 204 CONCUR (#1261) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - House - House Vote on SB 204 FINAL PASSAGE (#1168) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 204 FINAL PASSAGE (#406) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - House - House Vote on SB 204 FINAL PASSAGE (#1168) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 204 FINAL PASSAGE (#406) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-01 | Senate | Effective date 8/1/2018. |
2018-06-01 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 652. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018. |
2018-05-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2018-05-16 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-05-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/18. |
2018-05-11 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-05-10 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2018-05-09 | House | Reported with amendments (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-04-18 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2018-04-17 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |