LA SB202 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-18 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-18 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for health insurance coverage for participants in clinical trials. (8/1/20) (EG INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides for health insurance coverage for participants in clinical trials. (8/1/20) (EG INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. Kirk Talbot [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-18 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title; ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. |