LA SB202 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Constitutional amendment to rename the Budget Stabilization Fund to the Budget and Transportation Stabilization Trust and to provide for use of monies in the fund. (2/3s CA 13s 1 (A)) (EN SEE FISC NOTE SD RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Constitutional amendment to rename the Budget Stabilization Fund to the Budget and Transportation Stabilization Trust and to provide for use of monies in the fund. (2/3s CA 13s 1 (A)) (EN SEE FISC NOTE SD RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-08 - House - House Vote on SB 202 FINAL PASSAGE (#834) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-05-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 202 FINAL PASSAGE (#462) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-07-01SenateEffective date: See Act.
2015-07-01SenateBecomes Act No. 473
2015-06-11SenateSent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/15/2015.
2015-06-08HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2015-06-08SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2015-06-08SenateReceived from the House without amendments.
2015-06-08HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2015-06-08HouseRules suspended, called out of its regular order.
2015-06-03HouseScheduled for floor debate on 6/08/2015.
2015-06-03HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2015-06-02HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2015-06-01HouseReported favorably (14-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2015-05-27HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
2015-05-26HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2015-05-25SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2015-05-20SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2015-05-19SenateReported with amendments.
2015-04-13SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance.
2015-04-02SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Finance.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=15rs&b=SB202&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=935952
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=949088
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=951452
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=957201
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=960528
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=948851
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=949211
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=951339
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=949785
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=935954
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=944083
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=950441
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=950373
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=951475
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=953392
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=959672
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=959012
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=951382
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=956971

Bill Comments

feedback