LA SB201 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-6)
Status: Passed on June 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-14 - Effective date 8/1/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for meetings of boards and commissions via electronic means. (8/1/23) (EN SEE FISC NOTE EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for meetings of boards and commissions via electronic means. (8/1/23) (EN SEE FISC NOTE EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-08 - House - House Vote on SB 201 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1221) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 201 ADOPT (#1021) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 201 REJECT (#916) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - House - House Vote on SB 201 FINAL PASSAGE (#945) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 201 CO-AUTHORS (#87) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 201 FINAL PASSAGE (#86) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-14SenateEffective date 8/1/2023.
2023-06-14SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 393.
2023-06-08SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2023-06-08HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2023-06-08SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2023-06-08SenateNotice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
2023-06-08HouseConference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
2023-06-08HouseRules suspended.
2023-06-08SenateConference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays.
2023-06-08HouseConference Committee report received.
2023-06-07HouseNotice of Senate conferees appointed.
2023-06-07SenateSenate conference committee members appointed: Hewitt, Milligan, and Price.
2023-06-07SenateNotice House Conference Committee members appointed.
2023-06-07HouseHouse conferees appointed: Newell, Stefanski, and Gregory Miller.
2023-06-07HouseNotice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
2023-06-06SenateRules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays.
2023-06-05SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2023-06-05HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2023-06-04HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/05/2023.
2023-05-25HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2023-05-24HouseReported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
2023-05-23HouseReported with amendments (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2023-04-27HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2023-04-26HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2023-04-25SenateRules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2023-04-19SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2023-04-18SenateReported with amendments.
2023-04-10SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
2023-03-31SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=23rs&b=SB201&sbi=y
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1310014
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1313033
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1315765
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1331933
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1332592
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1312999
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1310441
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1314290
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1322335
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1324132
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1325142
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1324839
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1325293
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1324998
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1329796
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1326034
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1310015
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1313807
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1315905
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1319267
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1325165
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1326521
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1329985
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1330277
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1330523
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1331876
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1332095
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1334548
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1315733
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1315734
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1329885
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1330906
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1331885
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1331892

Bill Comments

feedback