LA SB201 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/19.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Repeals the Washington Parish Reservoir District and directs the transfer of any remaining property and excess funds to the Department of Culture, Recreation and Tourism in support of the Bogue Chitto State Park. (See Act) (RE SEE FISC NOTE OF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeals the Washington Parish Reservoir District and directs the transfer of any remaining property and excess funds to the Department of Culture, Recreation and Tourism in support of the Bogue Chitto State Park. (See Act) (RE SEE FISC NOTE OF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 201 FINAL PASSAGE (#127) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/30/19.
2019-05-22HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-21HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2019-05-20HouseReported favorably (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-04-29HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2019-04-25HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2019-04-24SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-04-23SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-04-22SenateRules suspended. Reported with amendments.
2019-04-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance.
2019-03-27SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Finance.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=SB201&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1122131
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125994
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127240
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125600
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126197
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1122134
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125647
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126672
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127058
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127348
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127948
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127183

Bill Comments

feedback