LA SB201 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-29 - Effective date 1/1/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-29 - Effective date 1/1/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes "I'm a Cajun" on driver's license and identification cards. (1/1/14) (EN INCREASE SG EX See Note)
Title
Authorizes "I'm a Cajun" on driver's license and identification cards. (1/1/14) (EN INCREASE SG EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-20 - House - House Vote on SB 201 FINAL PASSAGE (#484) (Y: 74 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 201 CO-AUTHORS (#291) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 201 FINAL PASSAGE (#290) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 201 CO-AUTHORS (#291) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 201 FINAL PASSAGE (#290) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-29 | Senate | Effective date 1/1/2014. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 55. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2013-05-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2013-05-20 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 74, nays 9. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-05-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/20/2013. |
2013-05-15 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent. |
2013-05-14 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2013-05-13 | House | Reported favorably (14-0) (Local and Consent). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2013-05-09 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. |
2013-05-08 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |