LA SB201 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-11 - Effective date 8/1/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-11 - Effective date 8/1/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requires state and local agencies engaged in lead hazard reduction activities to publish on their Internet website the standards related to those activities. (8/1/12) (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF EX See Note)
Title
Requires state and local agencies engaged in lead hazard reduction activities to publish on their Internet website the standards related to those activities. (8/1/12) (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 201, CONCUR (#1572) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - House - House Vote on SB 201, FINAL PASSAGE (#1303) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 201, FINAL PASSAGE (#592) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - House - House Vote on SB 201, FINAL PASSAGE (#1303) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 201, FINAL PASSAGE (#592) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-11 | Effective date 8/1/12. | |
2012-06-11 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 734. | |
2012-06-01 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2012-06-01 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-06-01 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-05-31 | Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. | |
2012-05-30 | Received from the House with amendments. | |
2012-05-30 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-05-24 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/30/2012. | |
2012-05-21 | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-05-17 | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2012-05-16 | Reported with amendments (10-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2012-05-01 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. | |
2012-04-30 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2012-04-30 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-04-30 | Called from the Calendar. | |
2012-04-16 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |
2012-04-11 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2012-04-10 | Reported favorably. | |
2012-03-12 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Environmental Quality. | |
2012-02-28 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Environmental Quality. |