LA SB2 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-02 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-02 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment to phase out the tax on inventory and establish the maximum allowable exemption for the industrial property tax exemption program. (2/3 - CA13s1(A)) (EG SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)
Title
Constitutional amendment to phase out the tax on inventory and establish the maximum allowable exemption for the industrial property tax exemption program. (2/3 - CA13s1(A)) (EG SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-02 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |