LA SB2 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Designates a portion of LA 25 in Washington Parish as the "Jerry Joe Rayburn Memorial Highway". (8/1/19) (EG1 +$1,100 SG EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designates a portion of LA 25 in Washington Parish as the "Jerry Joe Rayburn Memorial Highway". (8/1/19) (EG1 +$1,100 SG EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - House - House Vote on SB 2 FINAL PASSAGE (#584) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 2 FINAL PASSAGE (#68) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-16HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/23/19.
2019-05-15HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-14HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2019-05-13HouseReported with amendments (16-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-04-22HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2019-04-17HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2019-04-17SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-04-16SenateRead by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-04-15SenateReported favorably.
2019-04-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2019-01-29SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=SB2&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1111481
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1123780
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1133305
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1133429
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134778
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1111482
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1120739
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125095
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125235
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1133596
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125528
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137450

Bill Comments

feedback