LA SB2 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-24 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-24 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for membership of and election to the board of trustees. (1/1/12) (EN NO IMPACT APV)
Title
Provides for membership of and election to the board of trustees. (1/1/12) (EN NO IMPACT APV)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-14 - House - House Vote on SB 2, FINAL PASSAGE (#586) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 2, FINAL PASSAGE (#195) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 2, FINAL PASSAGE (#195) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-24 | Effective date: See Act. | |
2011-06-24 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 119. | |
2011-06-16 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2011-06-16 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2011-06-15 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2011-06-14 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2011-06-14 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-06-09 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/14/2011. | |
2011-06-09 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent. | |
2011-06-08 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2011-06-07 | Reported favorably (6-0) (Local and Consent). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2011-05-23 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement. | |
2011-05-19 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2011-05-18 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2011-05-17 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |
2011-05-16 | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. | |
2011-04-25 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Retirement. | |
2011-03-11 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Retirement. |