LA SB2 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-21 - Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-21 - Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to deposits into and transfers out of the Budget Stabilization Fund. (See Act) (REF SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)
Title
Provides relative to deposits into and transfers out of the Budget Stabilization Fund. (See Act) (REF SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 2, REJECT (#1928) (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on SB 2, FINAL PASSAGE (#1842) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate (#1900) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on SB 2, ON THE 82D DAY (#1839) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 2, FINAL PASSAGE (#933) (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on SB 2, FINAL PASSAGE (#1842) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate (#1900) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on SB 2, ON THE 82D DAY (#1839) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 2, FINAL PASSAGE (#933) (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-21 | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. | |
2010-06-20 | House conferees appointed: Leger, Fannin, and Tucker. | |
2010-06-20 | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. | |
2010-06-20 | Senate conference committee members appointed: Chaisson, Michot, and Jackson, L.. | |
2010-06-20 | Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments. | |
2010-06-20 | Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 35 yeas and 1 nays. Conference Committee appointments pending. | |
2010-06-18 | Received from the House with amendments. | |
2010-06-18 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-06-18 | Called from the calendar. | |
2010-06-18 | Notice Senate approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day. | |
2010-06-18 | Read by title. The Senate approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays. | |
2010-06-18 | Notice House approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day. | |
2010-06-18 | By a vote of 89 yeas, 0 nays the House approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day. | |
2010-06-17 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/18/2010. | |
2010-06-17 | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-06-16 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2010-06-16 | Reported with amendments (21-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-06-03 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | |
2010-06-02 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2010-06-02 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 7 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-05-27 | Read by title; made Special Order of the Day No. 2 for 06/02. | |
2010-05-27 | Rules suspended | |
2010-05-24 | Read by title; made Special Order of the Day No. 2 for 06/01. | |
2010-05-24 | Rules suspended | |
2010-05-19 | Read by title; made Special Order of the Day No. 2 for 05/25. | |
2010-05-19 | Rules suspended | |
2010-05-18 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |
2010-05-17 | Reported with amendments. | |
2010-03-29 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Finance. | |
2010-03-03 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Finance. |