LA SB196 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes local governments to charge a fee on certain gaming winnings to fund local early childhood programs. (8/1/19)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes local governments to charge a fee on certain gaming winnings to fund local early childhood programs. (8/1/19)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 196 FINAL PASSAGE (#148) (Y: 16 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30SenateReconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2019-04-29SenateNotice of reconsideration on the next legislative day.
2019-04-29SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 16 yeas and 21 nays.
2019-04-24SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-04-23SenateReported with amendments.
2019-04-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2019-03-27SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback