LA SB196 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-20 - Effective date 8/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the state uniform construction code and the powers of the state fire marshal. (8/1/18)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the state uniform construction code and the powers of the state fire marshal. (8/1/18)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 196 CONCUR (#1054) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House Vote on SB 196 FINAL PASSAGE (#812) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 196 FINAL PASSAGE (#263) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-20SenateEffective date 8/1/2018.
2018-05-20SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 364.
2018-05-16SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2018-05-15HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-15SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2018-05-14SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays.
2018-05-11SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2018-05-08HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2018-05-03HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/08/18.
2018-04-25HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-04-24HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2018-04-23HouseReported with amendments (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-04-06HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
2018-04-05HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2018-04-04SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-03-22SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-03-21SenateRules suspended. Reported with amendments.
2018-03-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
2018-03-01SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=SB196&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1070405
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1077764
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083157
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095860
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1101114
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1076956
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1077959
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1089057
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1088774
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1094543
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1070409
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1078128
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083260
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1089059
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1101014
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083113
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1094413
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1096445

Bill Comments

feedback