LA SB196 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-04 - Effective date 7/1/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-04 - Effective date 7/1/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the annual reporting to the Joint Legislative Committee on the Budget by departments and public postsecondary education management boards on enacted legislation with significant fiscal impact. (7/1/13) (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides for the annual reporting to the Joint Legislative Committee on the Budget by departments and public postsecondary education management boards on enacted legislation with significant fiscal impact. (7/1/13) (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 196 CONCUR (#609) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - House - House Vote on SB 196 FINAL PASSAGE (#563) (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 196 FINAL PASSAGE (#161) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - House - House Vote on SB 196 FINAL PASSAGE (#563) (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 196 FINAL PASSAGE (#161) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-04 | Senate | Effective date 7/1/2013. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 96. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2013-05-28 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2013-05-22 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 79, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-05-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on May 22, 2013. |
2013-05-15 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. |
2013-05-14 | House | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2013-05-13 | House | Reported favorably (14-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2013-04-29 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2013-04-25 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Finance. |