LA SB196 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-23 - Notice of Senate reconsideration and adoption of Conference Committee Report.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides a preference for the purchase of steel pipe manufactured in Louisiana. (8/15/11) (EGF SEE FISC NOTE LF EX)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides a preference for the purchase of steel pipe manufactured in Louisiana. (8/15/11) (EGF SEE FISC NOTE LF EX)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-06-23 - House - House Vote on SB 196, MOTION TO REJECT (#950) (Y: 78 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-06-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 196, ADOPT (#1032) (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 196, RECONSIDER Vote (#1031) (Y: 20 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 196, ADOPT (#1018) (Y: 15 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2011-06-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 196, REJECT (#979) (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-06-20 - House - House Vote on SB 196, FINAL PASSAGE (#754) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 196, FINAL PASSAGE (#626) (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-23 Notice of Senate reconsideration and adoption of Conference Committee Report.
2011-06-23 Notice of Senate rejecting Conference Committee Report.
2011-06-23 Notice House rejected the Conference Committee Report.
2011-06-23 Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 22 yeas and 15 nays.
2011-06-23 Reconsidered.
2011-06-23 By a vote of 20 yeas and 17 nays.
2011-06-23 Rules suspended
2011-06-23 Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 78, nays 16. The Conference Committee Report was rejected.
2011-06-23 Conference Committee Report read; failed to be adopted by a vote of 15 yeas and 18 nays.
2011-06-23 Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
2011-06-23 House conferees appointed: Greene, Carmody, and Sam Jones.
2011-06-23 Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
2011-06-23 Senate conference committee members appointed: Marionneaux, McPherson, and Broome.
2011-06-23 Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
2011-06-22 Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 30 yeas and 1 nays. Conference Committee appointments pending.
2011-06-22 Rules suspended. Called from the calendar.
2011-06-21 Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2011-06-20 Received from the House with amendments.
2011-06-20 Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2011-06-19 Scheduled for floor debate on 6/20/2011.
2011-06-19 Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
2011-06-19 Rules suspended.
2011-06-19 Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2011-06-16 Rules suspended. Reported favorably (10-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2011-06-16 Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2011-06-15 Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
2011-06-15 Read by title, passed by a vote of 25 yeas and 8 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2011-06-15 Rules suspended. Called from the calendar.
2011-05-31 Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2011-05-24 Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage.
2011-05-23 Reported with amendments.
2011-04-25 Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2011-04-15 Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback