LA SB195 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - Effective date 6/5/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - Effective date 6/5/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Grant Economic Development District to levy a sales and use tax. (gov sig)
Title
Authorizes the Grant Economic Development District to levy a sales and use tax. (gov sig)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-23 - House - House Vote on SB 195 FINAL PASSAGE (#581) (Y: 80 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 195 FINAL PASSAGE (#287) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 195 FINAL PASSAGE (#287) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-05 | Senate | Effective date 6/5/2013. |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 123. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2013-05-28 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2013-05-23 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 80, nays 1. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-05-21 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on May 23, 2013. |
2013-05-20 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent. |
2013-05-16 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2013-05-15 | House | Reported favorably (12-0) (Local and Consent). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2013-05-09 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2013-05-08 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |