LA SB194 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for an exception relative to contracts in which public entities are participants. (8/1/18)
Title
Provides for an exception relative to contracts in which public entities are participants. (8/1/18)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |