LA SB191 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Received from the House with amendments.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides actions for damages against real estate appraisers, appraisal management companies, and real estate appraisal companies. (8/1/19)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides actions for damages against real estate appraisers, appraisal management companies, and real estate appraisal companies. (8/1/19)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - House - House Vote on SB 191 FINAL PASSAGE (#546) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 191 FINAL PASSAGE (#141) (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2019-05-22HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-09HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/22/19.
2019-05-08HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-07HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2019-05-06HouseReported with amendments (7-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-04-30HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2019-04-29HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2019-04-25SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 27 yeas and 2 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-04-24SenateRead by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-04-23SenateReported favorably.
2019-04-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
2019-03-27SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=SB191&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1122054
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126341
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127488
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126370
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130735
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1131344
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1122057
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127293
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127677
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1131341
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127459
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137056

Bill Comments

feedback