LA SB190 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
Pending: House Transportation, Highways and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Transfers stationary weight enforcement to DOTD. (7/1/22)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transfers stationary weight enforcement to DOTD. (7/1/22)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 190 FINAL PASSAGE (#156) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-03HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2021-04-29HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2021-04-28SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-04-26SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-04-21SenateReported with amendments.
2021-04-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2021-04-02SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=SB190&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1211733
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216113
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218651
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216065
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1214482
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216552
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217838
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1211735
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217583
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218823
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217688
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218578

Bill Comments 750

feedback