LA SB19 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: House House and Governmental Affairs Committee
Hearing: May 29 @ 9:30 am in Room 2
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to criminal history record information obtained by the Louisiana State Board of Medical Examiners. (8/1/19) (RE SEE FISC NOTE SD EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to criminal history record information obtained by the Louisiana State Board of Medical Examiners. (8/1/19) (RE SEE FISC NOTE SD EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 19 FINAL PASSAGE (#56) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22HouseRead by title, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2019-05-21HouseReported favorably (13-0-1). To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2019-04-22HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2019-04-17HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2019-04-16SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 1 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-04-10SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-04-09SenateReported with amendments.
2019-04-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2019-02-27SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=SB19&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1113639
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1123534
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125060
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1123409
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1123662
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1113640
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1123430
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1123866
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124297
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1123917
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125162
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130775
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124980

Bill Comments

feedback