LA SB188 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-20 - Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
Pending: House Administration of Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Designates the crime of possession of a firearm by a felon as a "crime of violence". (gov sig) (RE SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designates the crime of possession of a firearm by a felon as a "crime of violence". (gov sig) (RE SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 188 FINAL PASSAGE (#251) (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-20HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2020-05-19SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 1 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-05-19SenateCalled from the Calendar.
2020-05-14SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2020-05-14SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted.
2020-05-13SenateRead by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-05-12SenateReported favorably.
2020-03-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
2020-02-26SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=20rs&b=SB188&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1160743
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171469
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174225
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172408
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172786
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174129
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1160748
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171979
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172383
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174312
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176195
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174198

Bill Comments

feedback