LA SB187 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-26 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Limits the alternative fuel tax credit for qualified clean-burning motor vehicle fuel property and qualified clean-burning motor vehicles (gov sig) (RE +$100,000 GF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Limits the alternative fuel tax credit for qualified clean-burning motor vehicle fuel property and qualified clean-burning motor vehicles (gov sig) (RE +$100,000 GF RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 187 FINAL PASSAGE (#269) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-26HouseInvoluntarily deferred in committee.
2015-05-13HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2015-05-12HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2015-05-11SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 1 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2015-05-07SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted; read by title and returned to its regular order on third reading and final passage.
2015-05-06SenateRead by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2015-05-05SenateReported favorably.
2015-04-13SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
2015-04-02SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=15rs&b=SB187&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=935709
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=944444
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=946969
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=945971
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=946897
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=935714
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=944078
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=945825
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=946455
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=947022
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=948452
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=946934

Bill Comments

feedback