LA SB184 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 51-9-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits the abortion of an unborn human being with a detectable heartbeat. (See Act)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits the abortion of an unborn human being with a detectable heartbeat. (See Act)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-29 - House - House Vote on SB 184 FINAL PASSAGE (#661) (Y: 79 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - House - House Vote on SB 184 AMENDMENT # 3416 BY STOKES MOTION TO ADOPT (#660) (Y: 34 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-05-29 - House - House Vote on SB 184 AMENDMENT # 3414 BY BAGNERIS MOTION TO ADOPT (#659) (Y: 24 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-05-29 - House - House Vote on SB 184 AMENDMENT # 3332 BY JAMES MOTION TO ADOPT (#658) (Y: 35 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 184 CO-AUTHORS (#244) (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 184 FINAL PASSAGE (#243) (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-30SenateEffective date: See Act.
2019-05-30SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 31.
2019-05-30SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2019-05-30HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2019-05-30SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2019-05-29SenateReceived from the House without amendments.
2019-05-29HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 79, nays 23. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-20HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/29/19.
2019-05-20HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-16HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2019-05-15HouseReported favorably (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2019-05-07HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2019-05-06SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 5 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-05-01SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-04-30SenateReported with amendments.
2019-04-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
2019-03-27SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=SB184&sbi=y
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1122025
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129067
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1131516
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139272
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140119
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129014
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130213
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135734
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1138272
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1138349
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1138605
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139092
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139134
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139143
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139156
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139119
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1138957
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139191
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139175
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139167
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1122026
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130054
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1131647
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1145045
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1131490
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1131491
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139201

Bill Comments

feedback