LA SB178 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Effective date 5/23/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Effective date 5/23/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Allows students to wear bulletproof backpacks. (gov sig)
Title
Allows students to wear bulletproof backpacks. (gov sig)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 178 CONCUR (#1181) (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - House - House Vote on SB 178 FINAL PASSAGE (#1078) (Y: 82 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 178 FINAL PASSAGE (#295) (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - House - House Vote on SB 178 FINAL PASSAGE (#1078) (Y: 82 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 178 FINAL PASSAGE (#295) (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | Senate | Effective date 5/23/2018. |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 523. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2018-05-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 25 yeas and 1 nays. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2018-05-15 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 82, nays 6. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-05-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/18. |
2018-05-07 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-05-03 | House | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2018-05-02 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2018-04-09 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 2 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |