LA SB178 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-29 - Effective date 6/29/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to meat and poultry inspection. (gov sig)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to meat and poultry inspection. (gov sig)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-08 - House - House Vote on SB 178 FINAL PASSAGE (#841) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 178 FINAL PASSAGE (#135) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-29SenateEffective date 6/29/2015.
2015-06-29SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 267.
2015-06-09SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2015-06-08HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2015-06-08SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2015-06-08SenateReceived from the House without amendments.
2015-06-08HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2015-06-03HouseScheduled for floor debate on 6/08/2015.
2015-06-03HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2015-06-02HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2015-06-01HouseReported favorably (16-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2015-04-30HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
2015-04-29HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2015-04-28SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2015-04-22SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2015-04-21SenateReported with amendments.
2015-04-13SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
2015-04-02SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=15rs&b=SB178&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=935575
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=939985
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=942628
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=957183
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=960323
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=939948
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=940457
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=942184
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=935576
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=940963
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=942705
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=959025
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=942520
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=957014

Bill Comments

feedback