LA SB173 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-11 - Effective date 8/1/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-11 - Effective date 8/1/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the Traffic Court of New Orleans. (8/1/12) (EN NO IMPACT LF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to the Traffic Court of New Orleans. (8/1/12) (EN NO IMPACT LF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-03 - House - House Vote on SB 173, MOTION TO ADOPT (#1551) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 173, ADOPT (#1710) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 173, REJECT (#1316) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - House - House Vote on SB 173, FINAL PASSAGE (#922) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 173, FINAL PASSAGE (#366) (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 173, ADOPT (#1710) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 173, REJECT (#1316) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - House - House Vote on SB 173, FINAL PASSAGE (#922) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 173, FINAL PASSAGE (#366) (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-11 | Effective date 8/1/12. | |
2012-06-11 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 731. | |
2012-06-04 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2012-06-04 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-06-04 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-06-04 | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. | |
2012-06-03 | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. | |
2012-06-03 | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. | |
2012-06-03 | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. | |
2012-06-01 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/3/2012. | |
2012-06-01 | Conference committee report received. | |
2012-06-01 | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. | |
2012-05-30 | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. | |
2012-05-30 | House conferees appointed: Brossett, Arnold, and Garofalo. | |
2012-05-30 | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. | |
2012-05-29 | Senate conference committee members appointed: Murray, Morrell, and Peterson. | |
2012-05-23 | Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments. | |
2012-05-23 | Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. | |
2012-05-23 | Called from the Calendar. | |
2012-05-21 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |
2012-05-17 | Received from the House with amendments. | |
2012-05-16 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-05-10 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/16/2012. | |
2012-05-02 | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-05-01 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2012-04-30 | Reported with amendments (16-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2012-04-16 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. | |
2012-04-12 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2012-04-12 | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 1 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-04-11 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2012-04-10 | Reported favorably. | |
2012-03-12 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. | |
2012-02-28 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |