LA SB172 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - Effective date 6/26/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - Effective date 6/26/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Terminates certain tax credits as of January 1, 2019. (gov sig) (EN +$27,000,000 GF RV See Note)
Title
Terminates certain tax credits as of January 1, 2019. (gov sig) (EN +$27,000,000 GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-08 - House - House Vote on SB 172 SUSPEND THE RULES (#949) (Y: 62 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 172 ADOPT (#943) (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 172 REJECT (#877) (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - House - House Vote on SB 172 FINAL PASSAGE (#741) (Y: 60 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 172 FINAL PASSAGE SB 172 BY MORRELL (#215) (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 172 ADOPT (#943) (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 172 REJECT (#877) (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - House - House Vote on SB 172 FINAL PASSAGE (#741) (Y: 60 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 172 FINAL PASSAGE SB 172 BY MORRELL (#215) (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-26 | Senate | Effective date 6/26/2017. |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 403. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/12/2017. |
2017-06-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/9/2017. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2017-06-08 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 62, nays 28. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2017-06-08 | House | Rules suspended. |
2017-06-08 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 22 yeas and 12 nays. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2017-06-06 | House | House conferees appointed: Leger, Abramson, and Dwight. |
2017-06-06 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2017-06-06 | House | Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Morrell, LaFleur, and Donahue. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 30 yeas and 5 nays. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2017-06-05 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 60, nays 35. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2017-06-01 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/05/17. |
2017-06-01 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-05-31 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2017-05-30 | House | Reported with amendments (14-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2017-05-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2017-05-09 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 22 yeas and 14 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |