LA SB171 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-24 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to reports required of boards or commissions authorized to issue a license, permit, or certificate. (6/30/19)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to reports required of boards or commissions authorized to issue a license, permit, or certificate. (6/30/19)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-06 - House - House Vote on SB 171 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1037) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 171 ADOPT (#1021) (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 171 REJECT (#605) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - House - House Vote on SB 171 FINAL PASSAGE (#657) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 171 FINAL PASSAGE (#161) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-24SenateVetoed by the Governor.
2019-06-06SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2019.
2019-06-06HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2019-06-06SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2019-06-06SenateNotice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
2019-06-06HouseNotice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
2019-06-06HouseConference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
2019-06-06SenateConference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 28 yeas and 0 nays.
2019-06-04SenateNotice House Conference Committee members appointed.
2019-06-04HouseHouse conferees appointed: Gregory Miller, Lance Harris, and Jay Morris.
2019-06-03HouseNotice of Senate conferees appointed.
2019-06-03SenateSenate conference committee members appointed: Peterson, Hewitt, and Peacock.
2019-05-30HouseNotice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
2019-05-30SenateRules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays.
2019-05-29SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2019-05-29HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-20HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/29/19.
2019-05-20HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-16HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2019-05-15HouseReported with amendments (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-04-30HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2019-04-29HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2019-04-29SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-04-25SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-04-24SenateReported with amendments.
2019-04-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
2019-03-27SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=SB171&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1121474
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127719
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143535
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126399
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134429
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134255
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1133930
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137304
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135154
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139387
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1121476
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127850
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134437
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143410
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1145074
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1145454
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128632
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139145
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139696
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143451
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143477

Bill Comments

feedback