LA SB171 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective date 8/1/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective date 8/1/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for self-insured trust health insurance plans. (8/1/15)
Title
Provides for self-insured trust health insurance plans. (8/1/15)
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Morrish [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 171 CONCUR (#979) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - House - House Vote on SB 171 FINAL PASSAGE (#792) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 171 FINAL PASSAGE (#425) (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - House - House Vote on SB 171 FINAL PASSAGE (#792) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 171 FINAL PASSAGE (#425) (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | Senate | Effective date 8/1/2015. |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 455. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2015-06-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. |
2015-06-06 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2015-06-04 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2015-06-01 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/04/2015. |
2015-06-01 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2015-05-28 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2015-05-27 | House | Reported with amendments (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2015-05-26 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2015-05-26 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 28 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. |