LA SB170 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-9)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Creates the Rural Water Infrastructure Committee within the governor's office. (gov sig) (EG INCREASE GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates the Rural Water Infrastructure Committee within the governor's office. (gov sig) (EG INCREASE GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 170 CO-AUTHORS (#92) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 170 FINAL PASSAGE (#91) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2019-05-22HouseReported favorably (14-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-04-23HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
2019-04-22HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2019-04-22SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-04-17SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-04-16SenateReported with amendments.
2019-04-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
2019-03-27SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Environmental Quality.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback