LA SB170 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-28 - Called from the Calendar. Read by title; withdrawn from the files of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-28 - Called from the Calendar. Read by title; withdrawn from the files of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides with respect to the definition of a rural hospital. (8/1/12) (EG GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides with respect to the definition of a rural hospital. (8/1/12) (EG GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-28 | Called from the Calendar. Read by title; withdrawn from the files of the Senate. | |
2012-04-16 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |
2012-04-12 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2012-04-11 | Reported with amendments. | |
2012-03-12 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | |
2012-02-28 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |