LA SB168 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Effective date 5/23/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Exempts certain Department of Agriculture and Forestry records from the Public Records Law. (gov sig)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempts certain Department of Agriculture and Forestry records from the Public Records Law. (gov sig)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-09 - House - House Vote on SB 168 FINAL PASSAGE (#876) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 168 FINAL PASSAGE (#306) (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23SenateEffective date 5/23/2018.
2018-05-23SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 408.
2018-05-15SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2018-05-14HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-14SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2018-05-14SenateReceived from the House without amendments.
2018-05-09HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2018-05-03HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/09/18.
2018-04-27HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-04-26HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2018-04-25HouseReported favorably (7-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-04-11HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2018-04-10HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2018-04-09SenateThe bill, as previously amended, was read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 3 nays, ordered reengrossed, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-04-05SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted; read by title and returned to its regular order on third reading and final passage.
2018-03-28SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-03-27SenateReported with amendments.
2018-03-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
2018-02-28SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=SB168&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1069177
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1079330
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1084496
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1096136
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1101371
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1079285
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1079808
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1069180
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1080044
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1084576
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1101916
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1084439
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095096

Bill Comments

feedback