LA SB167 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-23 - Effective date 6/23/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-23 - Effective date 6/23/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the Board of Dentistry. (gov sig)
Title
Provides relative to the Board of Dentistry. (gov sig)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-02 - House - House Vote on SB 167 MOTION TO ADOPT (#1629) (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 167 ADOPT (#1689) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 167 REJECT (#1558) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - House - House Vote on SB 167 FINAL PASSAGE (#1308) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 167 FINAL PASSAGE (#483) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 167 ADOPT (#1689) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 167 REJECT (#1558) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - House - House Vote on SB 167 FINAL PASSAGE (#1308) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 167 FINAL PASSAGE (#483) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-23 | Senate | Effective date 6/23/2014. |
2014-06-23 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 856. |
2014-06-02 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/3/2014. |
2014-06-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2014-06-02 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2014-06-02 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2014-06-02 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 93, nays 1. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2014-06-02 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2014-06-02 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2014-06-01 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/2014. |
2014-06-01 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2014-06-01 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 1 nays. |
2014-06-01 | Senate | Conference committee report received. |
2014-06-01 | House | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2014-05-29 | House | House conferees appointed: Lopinto, Simon, and Hazel. |
2014-05-29 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Martiny, Heitmeier, and Gallot. |
2014-05-29 | House | Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments. |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 29 yeas and 0 nays. |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2014-05-28 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2014-05-22 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/28/2014. |
2014-05-15 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2014-05-14 | House | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2014-05-13 | House | Reported with amendments (14-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2014-04-28 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2014-04-24 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |