LA SB165 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the adjustments of ad valorem millages. (See Act)
Title
Provides for the adjustments of ad valorem millages. (See Act)
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 165 CONCUR (#987) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House Vote on SB 165 FINAL PASSAGE (#1053) (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 165 FINAL PASSAGE (#132) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House Vote on SB 165 FINAL PASSAGE (#1053) (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 165 FINAL PASSAGE (#132) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | Senate | Effective date: See Act. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 390. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/11/2021. |
2021-06-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2021-06-07 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 1. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2021-06-07 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2021-06-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/07/2021. |
2021-06-03 | House | Notice given. |
2021-06-03 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2021-06-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2021. |
2021-05-26 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-05-25 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2021-05-24 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2021-04-29 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2021-04-28 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |