LA SB165 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Effective date 6/11/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Effective date 6/11/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to promotional and competitive tests provided by municipal fire and police civil service boards. (2/3 - CA10s18) (gov sig)
Title
Provides relative to promotional and competitive tests provided by municipal fire and police civil service boards. (2/3 - CA10s18) (gov sig)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 165 CONCUR (#867) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - House - House Vote on SB 165 FINAL PASSAGE (#787) (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 165 FINAL PASSAGE (#299) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - House - House Vote on SB 165 FINAL PASSAGE (#787) (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 165 FINAL PASSAGE (#299) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-11 | Senate | Effective date 6/11/2019. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 275. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2019-06-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2019-05-31 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 85, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2019-05-31 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2019-05-29 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/31/19. |
2019-05-29 | House | Notice given. |
2019-05-29 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2019-05-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/29/19. |
2019-05-21 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-20 | House | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2019-05-16 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2019-05-13 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2019-05-09 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |