LA SB164 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the administration of prescription drug benefits. (8/1/19)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the administration of prescription drug benefits. (8/1/19)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 164 FINAL PASSAGE (#116) (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29HouseInvoluntarily deferred in committee.
2019-04-25HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2019-04-24HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2019-04-23SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 5 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-04-17SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-04-16SenateRules suspended. Reported with amendments.
2019-04-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2019-03-27SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=SB164&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1120985
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125026
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126710
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124917
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126647
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1138743
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1138638
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1138606
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1120986
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125617
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126935
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126678

Bill Comments

feedback