LA SB162 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-02 - Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-02 - Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for an increase in the state minimum wage. (2/3 - CAs2.1)(8/1/18)
Title
Provides for an increase in the state minimum wage. (2/3 - CAs2.1)(8/1/18)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 162 FINAL PASSAGE (#154) (Y: 17 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-02 | Senate | Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 17 yeas and 21 nays. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Read by title; made Special Order of the Day No. 3 for March 27, 2018. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |