LA SB162 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-13-1)
Status: Vetoed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-20 - Vetoed by the Governor. (See Journal Addendum Page 1)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-20 - Vetoed by the Governor. (See Journal Addendum Page 1)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for surrogacy contracts. (8/1/13) (EG SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides for surrogacy contracts. (8/1/13) (EG SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-02 - House - House Vote on SB 162 MOTION TO ADOPT (#710) (Y: 85 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-06-02 - House - House Vote on SB 162 MOTION TO ADOPT (#710) (Y: 87 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 162 ADOPT (#763) (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 162 REJECT (#605) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - House - House Vote on SB 162 FINAL PASSAGE (#560) (Y: 88 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 162 FINAL PASSAGE (#259) (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-06-02 - House - House Vote on SB 162 MOTION TO ADOPT (#710) (Y: 87 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 162 ADOPT (#763) (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 162 REJECT (#605) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - House - House Vote on SB 162 FINAL PASSAGE (#560) (Y: 88 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 162 FINAL PASSAGE (#259) (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-20 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor. (See Journal Addendum Page 1) |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2013-06-05 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2013-06-02 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 85, nays 12. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2013-06-02 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2013-05-30 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on June 2, 2013. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 32 yeas and 3 nays. |
2013-05-29 | House | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Conference committee report received. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2013-05-29 | House | House conferees appointed: Lopinto, Abramson, and Leger. |
2013-05-29 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Gary Smith, Nevers, and Murray. |
2013-05-28 | House | Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments. |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2013-05-22 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 5. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-05-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on May 22, 2013. |
2013-05-15 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. |
2013-05-14 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2013-05-13 | House | Reported with amendments (9-1-1) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2013-05-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2013-05-07 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 30 yeas and 4 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |